Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2022