House
|
03/01/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 434
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Substituted SB 434
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|