LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0489
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0489
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0489
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
November 3, 2021
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 10, 2022
Analysis
March 11, 2022
Analysis
January 24, 2022
Analysis
January 20, 2022
Analysis
January 18, 2022
Analysis
January 14, 2022