House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 926
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/SB 926
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/04/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|