House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 838
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 838
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|