Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 3, 2022