House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1006
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 1006
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Public Integrity & Elections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|