Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0567

Introduced
11/10/21  
Refer
11/19/21  
Refer
11/19/21  

Caption

Designation of the State Dessert

Companion Bills

FL S1006

Same As State Symbols

Similar Bills

LA HCR24

Recognizes Tuesday, April 9, 2013, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA HCR2

Recognizes Monday, April 4, 2011, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA HCR20

Recognizes April 10, 2012, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA SCR5

Designates Wednesday, April 16, 2025, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol.

LA HCR42

Recognizes April 7, 2010, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA SCR13

Recognizes Tuesday, April 9, 2024, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol.

AL SJR85

DECLARING CULLMAN COUNTY STRAWBERRY FESTIVAL AS THE ALABAMA STATE STRAWBERRY FESTIVAL.

LA HR5

Recognizes April 11, 2023, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol