Alabama 2023 Regular Session

Alabama Senate Bill SJR85

Introduced
5/24/23  
Engrossed
5/24/23  
Refer
5/24/23  
Report Pass
5/25/23  
Report Pass
5/25/23  
Enrolled
5/25/23  
Passed
5/25/23  

Caption

DECLARING CULLMAN COUNTY STRAWBERRY FESTIVAL AS THE ALABAMA STATE STRAWBERRY FESTIVAL.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HCR24

Recognizes Tuesday, April 9, 2013, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA HCR2

Recognizes Monday, April 4, 2011, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA HCR20

Recognizes April 10, 2012, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA SCR5

Designates Wednesday, April 16, 2025, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol.

LA HCR42

Recognizes April 7, 2010, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA SCR13

Recognizes Tuesday, April 9, 2024, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol.

LA HR5

Recognizes April 11, 2023, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol

LA HB94

Provides relative to the membership of the Louisiana Strawberry Marketing Board