Louisiana 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR24

Introduced
4/8/13  
Introduced
4/8/13  
Engrossed
4/8/13  
Engrossed
4/8/13  

Caption

Recognizes Tuesday, April 9, 2013, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HCR2

Recognizes Monday, April 4, 2011, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA HCR20

Recognizes April 10, 2012, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA HCR42

Recognizes April 7, 2010, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA SCR5

Designates Wednesday, April 16, 2025, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol.

LA SCR13

Recognizes Tuesday, April 9, 2024, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol.

LA HR5

Recognizes April 11, 2023, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol

LA HCR14

Recognizes April 8, 2014, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day

LA HR5

Designates April 9, 2019, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day