House | 04/22/2013 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |