House
|
03/08/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 620
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
PCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|