Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 3, 2022
Bill January 14, 2022