House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|