Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022