House
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1502
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 1502
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|