Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022