House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/18/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|