Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0661 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022