House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 1058
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted SB 1058
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|