Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0695 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2022
Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022