House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1012
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 1012
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|