Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 29, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022