Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022