Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 105, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|