Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0701 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022