House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 520
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 520
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|