Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0703 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022