House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 1186
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|