Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0717 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 05/09/2022

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0717z1.EAF.docx 
DATE: 5/9/2022 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 717    Agritourism 
SPONSOR(S): Tomkow, Buchanan and others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 1186 
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 114 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Approved 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
HB 717 passed the House on March 8, 2022, as SB 1186. 
 
Agritourism is one of the many methods farmers use to diversify and expand their income. An agritourism 
activity includes any agricultural related activity that is consistent with a bona fide farm, ranch, or in a working 
forest that allows members of the general public to view or enjoy its activities for recreational, entertainment, or 
educational purposes. These activities include farming, ranching, and historical, cultural, or harvest-your-own 
activities and attractions. An agritourism activity does not include the building of new or additional structures or 
facilities that are intended primarily to house, shelter, transport, or otherwise accommodate the general public. 
 
Florida’s greenbelt law allows properties classified as bona fide agricultural operations to be taxed according to 
the use value of the agricultural operation, rather than the development value. Generally, tax assessments for 
qualifying lands are lower than tax assessments for other uses.  
 
Agritourism is encouraged in Florida as a means to promote and perpetuate agriculture throughout the state. In 
2016, the Legislature declared its intent to promote agritourism as a way to support bona fide agricultural 
production by providing a secondary stream of revenue and by educating the general public about the 
agricultural industry. As such, the conduct of agritourism activity on a bona fide farm or on lands classified as 
agricultural does not limit, restrict, or divest the land of its agricultural classification as long as such lands 
continue to be used primarily for bona fide agricultural purposes. 
 
The bill prohibits the denial or revocation of an agricultural land classification solely due to the conduct of 
agritourism activity on a bona fide farm or the construction, alteration, or maintenance of a nonresidential farm 
building, structure, or facility on a bona fide farm that is used to conduct agritourism activities. So long as the 
building, structure, or facility is an integral part of the agricultural operation, the bill specifies that the land it 
occupies must be considered agricultural in nature. The bill requires such buildings, structures, and facilities 
and other improvements on the land to be assessed at their just value and added to the agriculturally assessed 
value of the land. 
 
The Revenue Estimating Conference estimated that in fiscal year 2022-23, the bill would have no cash impact 
and a recurring insignificant positive or negative impact on local government revenue.  
 
The bill was approved by the Governor on April 27, 2022, ch. 2022-77, L.O.F., and will become effective on 
July 1, 2022. 
    
STORAGE NAME: h0717z1.EAF.docx 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 5/9/2022 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Background 
 
Agritourism  
Of Florida's 35 million acres, almost 10 million acres are used for farming.
1
 This includes about 47,400 
farm operations that together produced cash receipts for around $7.31 billion in 2018.
2
 However, the 
farming business and the number of farms is declining throughout the state. In the 1990s, the 
agricultural economy increased only 5 percent compared to 25 percent and 50 percent in previous 
decades.
3
 As a result, 10,000 acres of land are lost each year to urban development.
4
 In order to 
continue farming, operators of small and medium-sized farms find ways to diversify and expand their 
incomes, either through new enterprises on the farm or off-farm employment.
5
  
 
Agritourism is one of the many methods farmers use to diversify and expand their income. An 
agritourism activity includes any agricultural related activity that is consistent with a bona fide
6
 farm, 
ranch, or in a working forest that allows members of the general public to view or enjoy its activities for 
recreational, entertainment, or educational purposes. These activities include farming, ranching, and 
historical, cultural, or harvest-your-own activities and attractions.
7
 An agritourism activity does not 
include the building of new or additional structures or facilities that are intended primarily to house, 
shelter, transport, or otherwise accommodate the general public.
8
 
 
Agricultural Land Valuation  
Florida’s greenbelt law
9
 authorizes properties classified as bona fide agricultural operations to be taxed 
according to the use value of the agricultural operation, rather than the development value.
10
 Generally, 
tax assessments for qualifying lands are lower than tax assessments for other uses.  
 
Agritourism is encouraged in Florida as a means to promote and perpetuate agriculture throughout the 
state. In 2016, the Legislature declared its intent to promote agritourism as a way to support bona fide 
agricultural production by providing a secondary stream of revenue and by educating the general public 
about the agricultural industry.
11
 As such, conducting an agritourism activity on a bona fide farm or on 
lands classified as agricultural does not limit, restrict, or divest the land of its agricultural classification 
as long as such lands continue to be used primarily for bona fide agricultural purposes.
12
  
 
Local governments are prohibited from adopting ordinances, regulations, rules, or policies that prohibit, 
restrict, regulate, or otherwise limit an agritourism activity on land that has been classified as 
agricultural land under Florida’s greenbelt law.
13
  
                                                
1
 University of Florida Institute of Food and Agricultural Sciences (UFIFAS), Expanding Florida's Farming Business to Incorporate 
Tourism, http://edis.ifas.ufl.edu/fr242 (last visited Jan. 27, 2022). 
2
 United States Department of Agriculture, Florida Agricultural Overview, available at 
https://www.nass.usda.gov/Statistics_by_State/Florida/Publications/Annual_Statistical_Bulletin/2020/A1thru10Over-
2020.pdf (last visited Jan. 27, 2022). 
3
 UFIFAS, Expanding Florida's Farming Business to Incorporate Tourism, http://edis.ifas.ufl.edu/fr242 (last visited Jan. 27, 2022). 
4
 Leon Kolankiewicz and Roy Beck, Sprawl in Florida, 2001, p. 4, available at 
https://www.numbersusa.com/content/files/pdf/FLsprawl.pdf (last visited Jan. 27, 2022).   
5
 UFIFAS, Expanding Florida's Farming Business to Incorporate Tourism, http://edis.ifas.ufl.edu/fr242 (last visited Jan. 27, 2022). 
6
 Section 193.461(3)(b), F.S., defines “bona fide agricultural purposes” to mean good faith commercial agricultural use of the land.    
7
 Section 570.86(1), F.S. 
8
 Id.  
9
 Section 193.461, F.S. 
10
 Id. 
11
 Section 570.85, F.S. 
12
 Section 570.87(1), F.S. 
13
 Section 570.85, F.S.   
STORAGE NAME: h0717z1.EAF.docx 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 5/9/2022 
  
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill revises the current statutory legislative intent regarding agritourism to remove a provision 
specifying that agritourism provides a secondary stream of revenue for agricultural producers. 
 
The bill prohibits the denial or revocation of an agricultural land classification solely due to the conduct 
of agritourism activity on a bona fide farm or the construction, alteration, or maintenance of a 
nonresidential farm building, structure, or facility on a bona fide farm that is used to conduct agritourism 
activities. So long as the building, structure, or facility is an integral part of the agricultural operation, the 
bill specifies that the land it occupies must be considered agricultural in nature. The bill also requires 
such buildings, structures, and facilities and other improvements on the land to be assessed at their just 
value and added to the agriculturally assessed value of the land. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
The Revenue Estimating Conference estimated that in fiscal year 2022-23, the bill would have no 
cash impact and a recurring insignificant positive or negative impact on local government revenue.  
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
The bill may have a positive fiscal impact on land owners who conduct agritourism activities and have 
property that would be reappraised as agricultural land under the bill.  
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None.