06/10/2022 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |||
House | 03/02/2022 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Substituted for SM 1108 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Received | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Favorable by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Now in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 11/30/2021 | Filed |