House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Original reference removed: Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Filed |