Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0831 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 2, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022