Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0837 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2022
Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022