House | 03/07/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 632 | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Now in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Favorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/03/2021 | Filed |