Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0847 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022