House
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 706
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 706
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
PCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/16/2021
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/16/2021
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|