Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0851 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022