House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in returning Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (620066)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Rules (175492); YEAS 12 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22 --If Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/08/22, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 95, NAYS 19
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/16/2021
|
Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/16/2021
|
Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|