Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0861 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 10, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022