House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1260
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 1260
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
PCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|