Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0897 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022