|
05/19/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-127
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1210
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 98, NAYS 16
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Original reference removed: Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
PCS added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|