Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0909 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 3, 2022