House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1222
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
PCS added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|