Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0937 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022