Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0959 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 18, 2022
Bill January 28, 2022
Bill January 22, 2022