House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|