Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022