House | 03/14/2022 | Died in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/20/2021 | Filed |